LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1361
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1361
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1361
Compare Versions
AB1361 Chaptered August 6, 2009
AB1361 Enrolled July 17, 2009
AB1361 Amended July 9, 2009
AB1361 Amended June 30, 2009
AB1361 Amended June 23, 2009
AB1361 Amended May 13, 2009
AB1361 Amended May 4, 2009
AB1361 Amended April 20, 2009
AB1361 Amended April 14, 2009
AB1361 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1361 Chaptered August 6, 2009
AB1361 Enrolled July 17, 2009
AB1361 Amended July 9, 2009
AB1361 Amended June 30, 2009
AB1361 Amended June 23, 2009
AB1361 Amended May 13, 2009
AB1361 Amended May 4, 2009
AB1361 Amended April 20, 2009
AB1361 Amended April 14, 2009
AB1361 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare