|
03/22/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2982.)
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 15).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected March 15.)
|
|
|
|
02/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 23).
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 986.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
|
|
|
|
01/22/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|