California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB142 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2009

Enrolled

Bill March 26, 2010

Chaptered

Bill April 8, 2010

Amended

Bill March 11, 2010
Bill February 1, 2010
Bill August 25, 2009
Bill April 13, 2009