LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB142
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB142
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB142
Compare Versions
AB142 Chaptered April 8, 2010
AB142 Enrolled March 26, 2010
AB142 Amended March 11, 2010
AB142 Amended February 1, 2010
AB142 Amended August 25, 2009
AB142 Amended April 13, 2009
AB142 Introduced January 22, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB142 Chaptered April 8, 2010
AB142 Enrolled March 26, 2010
AB142 Amended March 11, 2010
AB142 Amended February 1, 2010
AB142 Amended August 25, 2009
AB142 Amended April 13, 2009
AB142 Introduced January 22, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare