|
10/20/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 732, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
10/20/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 7132.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 67. Noes 7. Page 7132.)
|
|
|
|
10/07/2010
|
Read third time and amended. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Page 5227.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 4. Page 5231.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 7. Page 4803.)
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4592.)
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|