California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1619 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2010

Enrolled

Bill October 11, 2010

Chaptered

Bill October 20, 2010

Amended

Bill October 7, 2010
Bill April 19, 2010