LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1619
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1619
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1619
Compare Versions
AB1619 Chaptered October 20, 2010
AB1619 Enrolled October 11, 2010
AB1619 Amended October 7, 2010
AB1619 Amended April 19, 2010
AB1619 Introduced January 11, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1619 Chaptered October 20, 2010
AB1619 Enrolled October 11, 2010
AB1619 Amended October 7, 2010
AB1619 Amended April 19, 2010
AB1619 Introduced January 11, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare