|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5398.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 16).
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|