LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1650
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1650
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1650
Compare Versions
AB1650 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB1650 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB1650 Amended August 31, 2010
AB1650 Amended August 4, 2010
AB1650 Amended August 2, 2010
AB1650 Amended July 1, 2010
AB1650 Amended June 23, 2010
AB1650 Amended April 27, 2010
AB1650 Amended April 13, 2010
AB1650 Amended February 23, 2010
AB1650 Introduced January 13, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1650 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB1650 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB1650 Amended August 31, 2010
AB1650 Amended August 4, 2010
AB1650 Amended August 2, 2010
AB1650 Amended July 1, 2010
AB1650 Amended June 23, 2010
AB1650 Amended April 27, 2010
AB1650 Amended April 13, 2010
AB1650 Amended February 23, 2010
AB1650 Introduced January 13, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare