LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1650
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1650
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1650
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 13, 2010
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 13, 2010
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 30, 2010
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 31, 2010
Compare
Bill
August 4, 2010
Compare
Bill
August 2, 2010
Compare
Bill
July 1, 2010
Compare
Bill
June 23, 2010
Compare
Bill
April 27, 2010
Compare
Bill
April 13, 2010
Compare
Bill
February 23, 2010
Compare