|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 447, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:20 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6964.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Joint Rule 61(b)(16) suspended. (Page 5074.) Read third time and amended. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 5091.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 5091.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 4912.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Liu. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4912.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5399.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|