LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1662
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1662
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1662
Compare Versions
AB1662 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB1662 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB1662 Amended August 31, 2010
AB1662 Amended August 20, 2010
AB1662 Amended August 17, 2010
AB1662 Amended April 7, 2010
AB1662 Amended March 10, 2010
AB1662 Introduced January 19, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1662 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB1662 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB1662 Amended August 31, 2010
AB1662 Amended August 20, 2010
AB1662 Amended August 17, 2010
AB1662 Amended April 7, 2010
AB1662 Amended March 10, 2010
AB1662 Introduced January 19, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare