California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1662 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2010

Amended

Bill August 31, 2010
Bill August 20, 2010
Bill August 17, 2010
Bill April 7, 2010
Bill March 10, 2010