|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 5. Page 5391.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 5341.).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|