California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1932 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2010

Amended

Bill August 4, 2010
Bill May 28, 2010
Bill May 3, 2010
Bill April 15, 2010
Bill April 5, 2010