LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1932
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1932
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1932
Compare Versions
AB1932 Amended August 4, 2010
AB1932 Amended May 28, 2010
AB1932 Amended May 3, 2010
AB1932 Amended April 15, 2010
AB1932 Amended April 5, 2010
AB1932 Introduced February 17, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1932 Amended August 4, 2010
AB1932 Amended May 28, 2010
AB1932 Amended May 3, 2010
AB1932 Amended April 15, 2010
AB1932 Amended April 5, 2010
AB1932 Introduced February 17, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare