|
08/27/2010
|
Joint Rules 61(b)(15) and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4959.) In committee: Motion to place on APPR. suspense file refused. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 27).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Reconsideration granted. From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (August 11).
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Senate Rule 21.5(k)(2) suspended. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4446.)
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4935.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|