LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1955
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1955
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1955
Compare Versions
AB1955 Amended August 30, 2010
AB1955 Amended August 20, 2010
AB1955 Amended August 18, 2010
AB1955 Amended August 10, 2010
AB1955 Amended June 23, 2010
AB1955 Amended April 12, 2010
AB1955 Amended March 18, 2010
AB1955 Introduced February 17, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1955 Amended August 30, 2010
AB1955 Amended August 20, 2010
AB1955 Amended August 18, 2010
AB1955 Amended August 10, 2010
AB1955 Amended June 23, 2010
AB1955 Amended April 12, 2010
AB1955 Amended March 18, 2010
AB1955 Introduced February 17, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare