California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1955 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2010

Amended

Bill August 30, 2010
Bill August 20, 2010
Bill August 18, 2010
Bill August 10, 2010
Bill June 23, 2010
Bill April 12, 2010
Bill March 18, 2010