|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 539, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:20 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 55. Noes 17. Page 6223.)
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4460.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 15).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 8. Page 5031.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|