California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1996 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2010

Amended

Bill June 1, 2010
Bill April 14, 2010
Bill April 7, 2010