California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1996 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/29/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1996CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 539 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 29, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 29, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 11, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 16, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 1, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 7, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Hill FEBRUARY 17, 2010 An act to amend an initiative act entitled "An act prescribing the terms upon which licenses may be issued to practitioners of chiropractic, creating the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners and declaring its powers and duties, prescribing penalties for violation thereof, and repealing all acts and parts of acts inconsistent therewith" approved by electors November 7, 1922, by amending Section 12 thereof, relating to chiropractors, and making an appropriation therefor. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1996, Hill. Chiropractors: license renewal fee. Existing law, the Chiropractic Act, enacted by initiative, provides for the licensure and regulation of chiropractors by the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners. Under the act, each person practicing chiropractic, after a license has been issued, is annually required to pay the board a renewal fee not exceeding $150, as determined by the board. Existing law authorizes the Legislature to fix these fees. Existing law directs the deposit of these funds into the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners' Fund, a continuously appropriated fund. This bill would require a licensee to pay an annual renewal fee of $250. By increasing the amount deposited in the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners' Fund, the bill would make an appropriation. Appropriation: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 12 of the act cited in this title is amended to read: Sec.12. Licenses issued under the provisions of this section expire at 12 midnight on the last day of the month of birth of licentiates of the board. On or before July 1, 1991, the board shall establish regulations for the administration of a birth month renewal program. Each person practicing chiropractic within this state shall, on or before the last day of their month of birth of each year, after a license is issued to them as herein provided, pay to the Board of Chiropractic Examiners a renewal fee of two hundred fifty dollars ($250). The secretary shall mail to all licensed chiropractors in this state, on or before 60 days prior to the last day of the month of their birth each year, a notice that the renewal fee will be due on or before the last day of the month of their birth next following. Nothing in this act shall be construed to require the receipts to be recorded in like manner as original licenses. The failure, neglect or refusal of any person holding a license or certificate to practice under this act in the State of California to pay the annual fee during the time their license remains in force shall, after a period of 60 days from the last day of the month of their birth, automatically work a forfeiture of his or her license or certificate, and it shall not be restored except upon the written application therefor and the payment to the board of a fee of twice the annual amount of the renewal fee in effect at the time the restoration application is filed except that a licentiate who fails, refuses or neglects to pay the annual tax within a period of 60 days after the last day of the month of his or her birth of each year shall not be required to submit to an examination for the reissuance of the certificate.