|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 462, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6558.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6581.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 4795.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5462.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|