California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2178 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2010

Amended

Bill August 19, 2010
Bill May 28, 2010
Bill April 14, 2010