BILL NUMBER: AB 2178CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 462 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 29, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 29, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 23, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 24, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 19, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 28, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Torlakson FEBRUARY 18, 2010 An act to add Section 8484.1 to the Education Code, relating to the After School Education and Safety Program. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2178, Torlakson. After School Education and Safety Program. Existing law establishes the After School Education and Safety Program for the purpose of creating incentives for establishing locally driven before and after school enrichment programs both during schooldays and summer, intersession, or vacation days that partner public schools and communities to provide academic and literacy support and safe, constructive alternatives for youth. Existing law authorizes a program to operate a before school component, an after school component, or both the before and after school components, on one or multiple schoolsites. Existing law awards grants to qualified applicants. This bill, to the extent consistent with federal and state privacy laws, would authorize local educational agency grantees funded pursuant to the After School Education and Safety Program and grants for 21st Century Community Learning Centers programs to submit specified data to an operator of an after school program with which the local educational agency has a contract. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 8484.1 is added to the Education Code, to read: 8484.1. To the extent consistent with federal and state privacy laws, local educational agency grantees funded pursuant to this article and Article 22.6 (commencing with Section 8484.7) may submit the following pupil data to an operator of an after school program with which the local educational agency has a contract: (a) Schoolday attendance data. (b) Standardized Testing and Reporting (STAR) Program test scores, and scores on individual California Standards Tests. (c) High school exit examination scores. (d) English language development test placement or reclassification scores. (e) California Healthy Kids Survey results in aggregate form.