|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 227, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 6717.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 24).
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6462.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4681.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 30). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1557.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|