California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB278 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2010

Amended

Bill August 17, 2010
Bill July 15, 2010
Bill June 21, 2010
Bill June 3, 2010