LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB278
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB278
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB278
Compare Versions
AB278 Chaptered September 24, 2010
AB278 Enrolled September 3, 2010
AB278 Amended August 17, 2010
AB278 Amended July 15, 2010
AB278 Amended June 21, 2010
AB278 Amended June 3, 2010
AB278 Introduced February 12, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB278 Chaptered September 24, 2010
AB278 Enrolled September 3, 2010
AB278 Amended August 17, 2010
AB278 Amended July 15, 2010
AB278 Amended June 21, 2010
AB278 Amended June 3, 2010
AB278 Introduced February 12, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare