|
07/15/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From inactive file. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Romero.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11))
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 6. Page 1952.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. (Corrected June 3.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|