California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB413 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2009

Amended

Bill July 1, 2010
Bill August 17, 2009
Bill July 13, 2009
Bill June 1, 2009
Bill May 5, 2009
Bill April 20, 2009
Bill April 13, 2009