LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB413
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB413
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB413
Compare Versions
AB413 Amended July 1, 2010
AB413 Amended August 17, 2009
AB413 Amended July 13, 2009
AB413 Amended June 1, 2009
AB413 Amended May 5, 2009
AB413 Amended April 20, 2009
AB413 Amended April 13, 2009
AB413 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB413 Amended July 1, 2010
AB413 Amended August 17, 2009
AB413 Amended July 13, 2009
AB413 Amended June 1, 2009
AB413 Amended May 5, 2009
AB413 Amended April 20, 2009
AB413 Amended April 13, 2009
AB413 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare