|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 444, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 62. Noes 15. Page 3294.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 2317.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 1606.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1530.).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|