LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB474
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB474
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB474
Compare Versions
AB474 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB474 Enrolled September 16, 2009
AB474 Amended September 4, 2009
AB474 Amended June 25, 2009
AB474 Amended May 18, 2009
AB474 Amended April 27, 2009
AB474 Amended April 14, 2009
AB474 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB474 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB474 Enrolled September 16, 2009
AB474 Amended September 4, 2009
AB474 Amended June 25, 2009
AB474 Amended May 18, 2009
AB474 Amended April 27, 2009
AB474 Amended April 14, 2009
AB474 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare