California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB474 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill September 4, 2009
Bill June 25, 2009
Bill May 18, 2009
Bill April 27, 2009
Bill April 14, 2009