|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 529, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6950.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 5070.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 5014.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (August 11).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
In committee: Set final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Corrected June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 8. Page 1979.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (March 24).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
12/08/2008
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/03/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 2.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|