California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB52 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 2, 2008

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2010

Amended

Bill August 30, 2010
Bill August 9, 2010
Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 16, 2010
Bill June 24, 2009
Bill June 2, 2009
Bill April 1, 2009
Bill March 5, 2009