LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB52
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB52
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB52
Compare Versions
AB52 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB52 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB52 Amended August 30, 2010
AB52 Amended August 9, 2010
AB52 Amended August 2, 2010
AB52 Amended June 16, 2010
AB52 Amended June 24, 2009
AB52 Amended June 2, 2009
AB52 Amended April 1, 2009
AB52 Amended March 5, 2009
AB52 Introduced December 2, 2008
Version 1 (Old)
AB52 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB52 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB52 Amended August 30, 2010
AB52 Amended August 9, 2010
AB52 Amended August 2, 2010
AB52 Amended June 16, 2010
AB52 Amended June 24, 2009
AB52 Amended June 2, 2009
AB52 Amended April 1, 2009
AB52 Amended March 5, 2009
AB52 Introduced December 2, 2008
Version 2 (New)
Compare