|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 46. Noes 29. Page 3257.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3191.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 16. Page 2170.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1756.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 16).
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 981.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|