LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB527
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB527
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB527
Compare Versions
AB527 Enrolled September 16, 2009
AB527 Amended August 27, 2009
AB527 Amended April 13, 2009
AB527 Amended March 19, 2009
AB527 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB527 Enrolled September 16, 2009
AB527 Amended August 27, 2009
AB527 Amended April 13, 2009
AB527 Amended March 19, 2009
AB527 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare