California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB527 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2009

Amended

Bill August 27, 2009
Bill April 13, 2009
Bill March 19, 2009