|
06/03/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 22, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:15 a.m.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 5346.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after May 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3479.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 2062.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 31).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|