California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB552 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2009

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2010

Chaptered

Bill June 3, 2010

Amended

Bill April 6, 2010
Bill March 15, 2010
Bill June 23, 2009
Bill June 1, 2009