LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB552
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB552
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB552
Compare Versions
AB552 Chaptered June 3, 2010
AB552 Enrolled May 28, 2010
AB552 Amended April 6, 2010
AB552 Amended March 15, 2010
AB552 Amended June 23, 2009
AB552 Amended June 1, 2009
AB552 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB552 Chaptered June 3, 2010
AB552 Enrolled May 28, 2010
AB552 Amended April 6, 2010
AB552 Amended March 15, 2010
AB552 Amended June 23, 2009
AB552 Amended June 1, 2009
AB552 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare