|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3367.)
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2390.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1452.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|