California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB623 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 21, 2009

Amended

Bill September 4, 2009
Bill September 2, 2009
Bill July 15, 2009
Bill July 8, 2009
Bill June 30, 2009
Bill May 11, 2009
Bill April 13, 2009