LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB623
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB623
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB623
Compare Versions
AB623 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB623 Amended September 4, 2009
AB623 Amended September 2, 2009
AB623 Amended July 15, 2009
AB623 Amended July 8, 2009
AB623 Amended June 30, 2009
AB623 Amended May 11, 2009
AB623 Amended April 13, 2009
AB623 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB623 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB623 Amended September 4, 2009
AB623 Amended September 2, 2009
AB623 Amended July 15, 2009
AB623 Amended July 8, 2009
AB623 Amended June 30, 2009
AB623 Amended May 11, 2009
AB623 Amended April 13, 2009
AB623 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare