|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 248, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3288.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 6. Page 2321.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 14).
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1469.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|