California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB636 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill September 4, 2009
Bill September 1, 2009
Bill July 16, 2009
Bill June 26, 2009
Bill June 23, 2009
Bill April 13, 2009