LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB636
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB636
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB636
Compare Versions
AB636 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB636 Enrolled September 16, 2009
AB636 Amended September 4, 2009
AB636 Amended September 1, 2009
AB636 Amended July 16, 2009
AB636 Amended June 26, 2009
AB636 Amended June 23, 2009
AB636 Amended April 13, 2009
AB636 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB636 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB636 Enrolled September 16, 2009
AB636 Amended September 4, 2009
AB636 Amended September 1, 2009
AB636 Amended July 16, 2009
AB636 Amended June 26, 2009
AB636 Amended June 23, 2009
AB636 Amended April 13, 2009
AB636 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare