|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 561, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 2219.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 2817.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2756.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1007.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4. Page 875.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2009
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 7.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|